IL HB4158 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0921
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0921
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Requires a common interest community association's board of managers or board of directors to maintain a record of any reserve study. Amends the Condominium Property Act. Requires the board of managers of every association to keep and maintain records of any reserve study.
Title
PROPERTY-RECORDS-RESERVE STUDY
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Croke [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 100 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0921 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 100-012-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-001-000 |
2022-04-03 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2022-03-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-001-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-23 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-02-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-010-001 |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-005-000 |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-09-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 160 | 1-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 605 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |