IL HB4157 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois. Requires a public university to classify as an employee of the university a student who is an athlete of any of the top 3 financially profitable intercollegiate athletic programs at the university. Provides that the university shall pay the student athlete a minimum of $25,000 per academic year, but his or her work hours and work schedule are at the discretion of the university. Allows the university to classify as an employee of the university a student who is an athlete of any of the other intercollegiate athletic programs at the university, with his or her pay, work hours, and work schedule determined by the university. Sets forth provisions concerning collegiate and intercollegiate athletic associations and contractual agreements. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
HIGHER ED-ATHLETE IS EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | First Reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 1e-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 8b.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4157&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4157.htm |