IL HB4157 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1037 |
2014-08-25 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-28 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000 |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2014-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary |
2014-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2014-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 012-004-000 |
2014-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |