IL HB4149 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the Executive Inspector General for the Attorney General for its FY16 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$EX IG AG-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] |
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-25 - House - Amendment in House (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - House - Amendment in House (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-08-25 - House - Amendment in House (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2016-01-03 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-08-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted 058-000-011 |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted 058-000-016 |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-08-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-08-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-08-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |