IL HB4148 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Contains a statement of legislative findings. Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act and the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that the Department of Human Rights shall, no later than 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, establish and maintain a sexual harassment in the workplace hotline with a toll-free telephone with voicemail capabilities and an Internet website through which persons may report instances of sexual harassment. Provides that the Department shall help persons who access the hotline find counseling and protective services, and assist in the filing of sexual harassment complaints through appropriate agencies. Provides that the Department shall advertise the hotline and encourage reporting by both those who are subject to sexual harassment and those who have witnessed it. Provides that the hotline shall provide the means through which persons may anonymously report sexual harassment in both private and public places of employment. Provides that in the case of sexual harassment by a person subject to the Executive Ethics Commission and Executive Inspectors General or the Legislative Ethics Commission and Legislative Inspector General Article of the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act, the Department shall, with the permission of the reporting individual, report the allegations to the Executive Inspector General or Legislative Inspector General for further investigation. Provides that the Executive Inspector General and Legislative Inspector General have the duty to investigate allegations of sexual harassment pertaining to State officials and employees, and to advertise the sexual harassment hotline on the website of the inspector general. Effective immediately.
Title
SEXUAL HARASSMENT HOTLINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2017-11-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 20-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 25-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 2-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4148&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4148.htm |