IL HB4148 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 7 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-11 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Allows the chief county assessment officer to record a tax lien against property that was granted one or more erroneous homestead exemptions. Contains provisions concerning notice, hearings, and penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-ERROR ASSESSMENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-11HouseSent to the Governor
2013-01-07HousePassed Both Houses
2013-01-07HouseHouse Concurs
2013-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 102-009-002
2013-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-009-002
2013-01-06HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2013-01-06HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2013-01-06HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-01-06HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2013-01-04HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-01-04HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2013-01-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2013-01-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 4
2013-01-04HouseArrived in House
2013-01-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2013-01-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2013-01-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2013-01-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2013-01-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Hutchinson
2013-01-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2013-01-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2013-01-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2012-12-07SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013
2012-12-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 5, 2012
2012-12-04SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2012-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
2012-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
2012-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2012-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive
2012-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2012-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012
2012-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2012-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2012-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
2012-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2012
2012-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2012-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
2012-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2012-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2012-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2012-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2012
2012-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 014-000-000
2012-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2012-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2012-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2012-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2012-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2012-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012
2012-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2012-05-02SenateAssigned to Executive
2012-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2012-03-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2012-03-22SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu
2012-03-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012
2012-03-22SenateArrive in Senate
2012-03-22HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-048-000
2012-03-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2012-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000
2012-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2012-03-08HouseRemains in Revenue & Finance Committee
2012-03-08HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000
2012-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2012-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2012-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente
2012-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks
2012-02-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2012-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2012-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2012-02-17HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2012-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2012-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
352009-275New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4148&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148ham002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148sam003.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148sam004.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4148enr.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB4148_03222012_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/senate/09700HB4148_01032013_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB4148_01072013_004001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB4148_01072013_004000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback