IL HB4147 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Office of the Executive Inspector General for the Governor for its FY16 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$EX IG GOV-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Madigan [D] | Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Sen. John Cullerton [D] |
Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-16 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2015-06-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto June 30, 2015 |
2015-06-25 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-06-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-027-000 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Motion Withdrawn Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-027-000 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2015 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-051-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 012-008-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |