IL HB4135 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sureties Act. Provides that the Act applies to sureties who share primary liabilities with their principals on promissory notes or performance or other contracts and whose primary liabilities originate from the contracts of their principals. Provides that the Act does not apply to guarantors of payment or guarantors of collection who undertake obligations to pay creditors of principal debtors, but whose obligations are not primary liabilities or are otherwise created by contracts that are separate from the contractual obligations of the principals. Effective immediately.
Title
SURETIES-PRIMARY LIABILITIES
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-26 | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-03-26 | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4135&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4135.htm |