IL HB4121 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Requires any individual serving in the role of guardian ad litem or child representative to meet with both parties and the child every 90 days. Provides that the first meeting shall occur within 90 days of appointment and a meeting shall occur in every subsequent 90-day period until the conclusion of the case. Requires the guardian ad litem or child representative to file with the court, within 90 days of his or her appointment and once in every subsequent 90-day period during the course of his or her representation, a document confirming that the guardian ad litem or child representative has met with both parties.
Title
IMDMA-CHILD REP RESPONSIBILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Family Law & Probate Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | To Family Law & Probate Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |