IL HB4113 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. To the list of purposes of the Act, adds recognizing that the involvement of each parent for equal time is presumptively in the children's best interests. Deletes language providing that nothing in the Act requires that each parent be allocated decision-making responsibilities. Provides that it is presumed that it is in the child's best interests to award equal time to each parent. Provides that it is presumed that both parents are fit and the court shall not place any restrictions on parenting time unless it finds by clear and convincing evidence (instead of a preponderance of the evidence) that a parent's exercise of parenting time would seriously endanger the child's physical, mental, moral, or emotional health. In specified situations, requires the court to issue a written decision stating its specific findings of fact and conclusions of law in support of its ruling. Provides that the court may restrict or modify parental responsibilities after a showing of clear and convincing evidence (instead of a preponderance of the evidence) that the restriction or modification is warranted.
Title
IMDMA-EQUAL PARENTING TIME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 007-005-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Restorative Justice Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-11 | House | Remains in Restorative Justice Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Restorative Justice Committee; 005-007-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Restorative Justice Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Re-assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-05 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-03-08 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-01-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-01-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-01-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-01-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-01-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-01-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-01-03 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-01-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2017-12-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-12-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-12-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-12-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-11-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-11-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-11-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-10-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-10-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-10-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-10-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 602.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 602.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 602.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 603.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |