IL HB4112 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-26 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-26 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Establishes the Office of Campaign Finance Disclosure Auditor within the State Board of Elections, under the direction and supervision of an Auditor appointed by the State Board. Requires the Auditor to audit campaign finance disclosure reports and authorizes the Auditor to conduct audits and investigations with respect to campaign finance statements and forms filed with the State Board.
Title
CAMPAIGN FINANCE AUDITOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-05-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4112&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4112.htm |