IL HB4093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sanctuary City Sanction Act. Provides that if a unit of local government has in place any policy that limits or restricts compliance with immigration detainers issued by the Secretary of Homeland Security or otherwise does not comply with an immigration detainer, all grants of State funds that the unit of local government would otherwise receive will not be distributed to the unit of local government until any policy that limits or restricts compliance with an immigration detainer is abolished and compliance with immigration detainers is demonstrated by the unit of local government. Defines terms. Repeals the Illinois TRUST Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SANCTUARY CITY SANCTION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-09-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2017-09-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-09-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2017-08-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4093&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4093.htm |