IL HB4091 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on August 30 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals the Illinois TRUST Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ILLINOIS TRUST ACT-REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-10-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-12HouseFirst Reading
2017-09-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-09-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-09-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-08-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-08-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-08-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-08-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-08-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback