IL HB4087 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Abolition of Confederate Symbols Act. Provides that no public body shall display the Battle Flag of the Confederacy, otherwise known as the "Confederate Flag", or any other similar image, on any public property or land in the State unless the flag or an image thereof appears in a book, digital medium, or museum, or is used to serve any other educational or historical purpose. Provides that no public body shall sell the Battle Flag of the Confederacy, or any other object or property containing an image of the flag, unless the flag or an image thereof appears in a book, digital medium, or museum, or is used to serve any other educational or historical purpose. Provides that no monument, memorial, or statue honoring the Confederate States of America or any soldier of the Confederacy shall be erected on public property or land in this State, or otherwise be erected using public funds. Provides that any monument, memorial, or statue honoring the Confederate States of America or any soldier of the Confederacy existing on public property or land as of the effective date of this Act shall be removed within a reasonable period of time thereafter. Defines terms.
Title
ABOLISH CONFEDERATE SYMBOL ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | First Reading |
2017-09-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-08-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4087&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4087.htm |