IL HB4083 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-6)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that, on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, no home rule county or non-home rule county has the authority to impose a tax on the use, sale, or purchase of sweetened beverages based upon the weight or volume of the sweetened beverage. Provides that any such tax in effect prior to that date is void and repealed. Defines "sweetened beverage". Preempts home rule. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-SWEETENED BEV TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-12-15 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2017-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-09-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-09-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-08-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-08-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-08-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-08-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-08-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-08-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-08-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-08-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-08-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017 |
2017-08-16 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-08-16 | House | First Reading |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-08-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-08-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1009.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4083&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4083.htm |