IL HB4078 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on July 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

If and only if Senate Bill 9 of the 100th General Assembly becomes law in the form in which it was amended by House Amendment No. 3, repeals the State Tax Lien Registration Act and the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act created by that bill. Repeals provisions of Senate Bill 9 of the 100th General Assembly that would have repealed the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act on January 1, 2018. Changes various Acts by restoring language deleted by Senate Bill 9 of the 100th General Assembly and deleting language added by Senate Bill 9 of the 100th General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPEAL/RESTORE VARIOUS-SB9

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-07-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-07-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-07-06HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-07-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-07-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-07-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-07-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-07-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-07-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-07-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-07-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-07-03HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-07-03HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-07-03HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-07-03HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-07-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
154059Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.02Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.03Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.04Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.05Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.06Amended CodeCitation Text
20120518.1Amended CodeCitation Text
2012057Amended CodeCitation Text
20520510090Amended CodeCitation Text
2052054013Amended CodeCitation Text
2052059012Amended CodeCitation Text
20530510Amended CodeCitation Text
20530562Amended CodeCitation Text
20540515.1bAmended CodeCitation Text
20540519.3Amended CodeCitation Text
205548Amended CodeCitation Text
205548.1Amended CodeCitation Text
205548.3Amended CodeCitation Text
205565Amended CodeCitation Text
2056206-14Amended CodeCitation Text
20565730Amended CodeCitation Text
20570010Amended CodeCitation Text
21515522Amended CodeCitation Text
21518515Amended CodeCitation Text
21518520Amended CodeCitation Text
2151855Amended CodeCitation Text
2155210Amended CodeCitation Text
22545420-20Amended CodeCitation Text
301056b-1Amended CodeCitation Text
301058.12Amended CodeCitation Text
302302Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-50Amended CodeCitation Text
351102Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351152Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-45Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351205aAmended CodeCitation Text
351205bAmended CodeCitation Text
351205cAmended CodeCitation Text
3551102Amended CodeCitation Text
3551103Amended CodeCitation Text
3551105Amended CodeCitation Text
3551501Amended CodeCitation Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text
355202.5Amended CodeCitation Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text
355204Amended CodeCitation Text
355208Amended CodeCitation Text
355212Amended CodeCitation Text
355225Repealed CodeCitation Text
355901Amended CodeCitation Text
3552016Amended CodeCitation Text
3552017Amended CodeCitation Text
3552019Amended CodeCitation Text
51001-5Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-3034Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-3-15Amended CodeCitation Text
7255110-17Amended CodeCitation Text
75552-1Amended CodeCitation Text
75552-2Amended CodeCitation Text
770903Amended CodeCitation Text
805105112.70Amended CodeCitation Text
805512.70Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback