IL HB4075 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that the board of commissioners of the Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago shall: on or before July 1, 2021, divide the Water Reclamation District of Greater Chicago into 9 commissioner districts and apportion the commissioner districts to reflect the results of the most recent federal decennial census; and thereafter, in the year following each federal decennial census, reapportion the commissioner districts to reflect the results of the most recent census. Provides that the commissioner districts shall be compact, contiguous, and substantially equal in population to each other district. Provides that one commissioner shall be elected from each commissioner district for a term of 6 years and that the commissioner shall be a resident of the commissioner district from which he or she was elected. Provides that if the corporate limits of the District expands between apportionments, the board of commissioners shall determine which commissioner district or districts the expanded territory will join until the next apportionment. Provides that the terms of all commissioners serving at the time of the 2022 general election shall continue until the first Tuesday after the first Monday in the month following the 2022 general election or until the 9 new commissioners are elected and qualified, whichever is later. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MWRD-APPORTIONMENT & ELECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-002-000
2017-06-27HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-27HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-27HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-06-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-06-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-06-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7026053Amended CodeCitation Text
7026053.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback