IL HB4074 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates the Department of Transportation's Capital expenses for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2017. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
$IDOT CAPITAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-06-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-06-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-06-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4074&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB4074.pdf |