IL HB4071 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safer Consumption Services Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, the Department of Public Health may approve an entity to operate a program in one or more jurisdictions upon satisfaction of specified requirements relating to, among other things, the safe and hygienic use of preobtained drugs. Requires the Department to establish standards for program approval and training and allows it to adopt any rules that are necessary to implement the Act. Requires the Department to approve or deny an application within 45 days after its receipt. Provides that a program approved by the Department must also be designated as an authorized needle and hypodermic syringe access program under the Overdose Prevention and Harm Reduction Act. Provides reporting requirements for entities operating programs under the Act. Provides that, except for criminal prosecution for any activities that are not conducted, permitted, and approved pursuant to the Act, specified persons related to a program shall not be subject to civil or criminal liability solely for participation or involvement in the program if it is approved by the Department under the Act.
Title
SAFER CONSUMPTION SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |