IL HB4068 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from public inspection certain information collected by the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission from self-insureds and papers, documents, reports, or evidence relevant to a workers' compensation fraud investigation conducted by the Department of Insurance. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 regarding workers' compensation fraud penalties. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Makes changes concerning: when an accidental injury shall not be considered to be "arising out of and in the course of employment" if the accidental injury or medical condition occurred while the claimant was traveling away from the employer's premises; the maximum compensation rate for a period of temporary total incapacity; compensation awards for injuries to the shoulder and hip; the maximum allowable payment for certain service categories; the assignment and reassignment of arbitrators to hearing sites; the creation of an evidence based drug formulary; annual reports on the state of self-insurance for workers' compensation in Illinois; and other matters. Effective immediately.
Title
WORKERS' COMP-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-06-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Labor & Commerce Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-06-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-06-21 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-10.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 305 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 25.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 29.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 8.2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4068&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4068.htm |