IL HB4067 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Citizens Empowerment Act. Provides that registered voters may petition for a referendum at the next general election to dissolve a unit of local government. Sets forth the requirements for the petition, together with the form and requirements for the ballot referendum. Provides for the transfer of property, assets, obligations, and liabilities of the dissolving unit of local government to the receiving unit of local government. Limits when a special district may dissolve into another unit of local government. Defines terms. Amends the Local Government Reduction and Efficiency Division of the Counties Code. Provides that the Division applies to all counties (currently, only applies to DuPage, Lake, and McHenry Counties). Excludes specified boards from the definition of "unit of local government". Provides how the status and rights of employees are affected by the dissolution of a unit of local government. Provides for the assumption of obligations of the dissolving unit of local government by the entity absorbing the dissolving unit. Amends the Township Code. Removes a restriction limiting townships to 126 square miles. Provides for the consolidation, merger, and dissolution of specified townships within a coterminous, or substantially coterminous, municipality. Makes other changes. Amends the Election Code. Specifies procedures for township consolidation, merger, and discontinuance referenda and provides exceptions for the Citizens Empowerment Act. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that specified township road districts may be abolished by public referendum. Effective on January 1, 2018.
Title
LOCAL GOVT-DISSOLUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-06-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 28-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 28-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 3-7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 2-4006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-44010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-44020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-44043 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | Div. 2-4 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 22-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 22-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 22-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 22-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 23-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 25-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 25-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 29-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 29-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 65-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 22 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 23 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | Art. 29 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
605 | 5 | 6-130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
605 | 5 | 6-130.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4067&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4067.htm |