IL HB4044 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum Act. Provides that the Executive Director of the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum shall appoint a Facilities Services Director (rather than a Library Facilities Operations Director) and a Library Services Director (rather than a Director of the Library). Provides that the State Historian may, with the consent of the Executive Director (rather than the Board of Trustees of the Abraham Lincoln Presidential Library and Museum), exchange specified materials which the library may acquire that are of no historical interest or for any reason are of no value to it, with any other library, school, or historical society. Removes provisions concerning the Illinois Historical Collections. Modifies requirements concerning the preservation of selected past editions of newspapers of this State as historical records. Repeals the State Historical Library Act. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LINCOLN PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading
2020-01-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
203425ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
20347530Amended CodeCitation Text
20347535Amended CodeCitation Text
20347545Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback