IL HB4044 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that the clerk of the circuit court shall transmit to the Department of Human Services, agency or institution, if any, to which an unfit defendant is remanded for treatment the complete copy of any fitness report prepared or other report prepared by a forensic examiner for the court. Provides that if the court finds that the defendant is still unfit after being recommended as fit by the supervisor of the defendant's treatment, the court shall attach a copy of any written report that identifies the factors in the finding that the defendant continues to be unfit, prepared by a licensed physician, clinical psychologist, or psychiatrist, to the court order remanding the person for further treatment.
Title
CRIM PRO-UNFIT DEFENDANT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0435 |
2015-08-21 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-05-20 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 104-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 104-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |