IL HB4025 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a written notice to terminate a year-to-year lease of farm land, unless there is a written agreement to the contrary, shall be given by August 1 of the then current year (instead of in writing by not less than 4 months prior to the end of the year of letting).
Title
CIV PRO-FARM LEASE-TERMINATION
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] |
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] | Rep. David Reis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2012-02-08 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-02-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Paul Evans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 9-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4025&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4025.htm |