IL HB4020 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charitable Games Act. Transfers all the powers of the Department of Revenue under the Act to the Illinois Gaming Board and makes related changes. Extends the licensure period from one year to 2 years. Changes the application and renewal fees from an annual $200 fee to a $400 fee for the 2-year licensure period. Provides that participation in the management or operation of the games is limited to no more than 12 (rather than 4) charitable games events, either of the sponsoring organization or any other licensed organization, during a calendar year. Provides that no single bet at any game may exceed $20. Provides that at the conclusion of the event or when the participant leaves, he or she may cash in his or her chips, scrip, or play money in exchange for currency not to exceed $500 in cash winnings (instead of $250) or unlimited noncash prizes. Provides that the provider of the premises, other than a municipality, may not rent or otherwise provide the premises for the conducting of more than one charitable games night per month (rather than 8 charitable games nights per year). Provides that 5% of the net proceeds (rather than 3% of the gross proceeds) of charitable games shall be paid to the Illinois Gaming Board. Provides that establishments that have video gaming terminals licensed under the Video Gaming Act may operate them along with charitable games under rules adopted by the Illinois Gaming Board. Makes other changes.
Title
CHARITABLE GAMES-GAMING BOARD
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2012-03-06 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2012-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-005-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2012-01-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 30 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |