IL HB4020 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Park District Act. In a Section concerning criminal background investigations for employment with the Chicago Park District, provides that the Chicago Park District shall submit an applicant's personal information to the Federal Bureau of Investigation (now, Department of State Police). Provides that the Federal Bureau of Investigation shall conduct a search of its criminal history record information database to determine if an applicant has been convicted of specified offenses (now, Department of State Police). Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
CHICAGO PARK-BACKGROUND INVEST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4020&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4020.htm |