IL HB4012 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $25,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Secretary of State for grants, on an emergency basis, to at-risk not-for-profit organizations for eligible security improvements that assist the organization in preventing, preparing for, or responding to acts of terrorism. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SOS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-15HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-03-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-03-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback