IL HB4004 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for water's edge combined reporting. Creates an addition modification in an amount equal to the deduction for qualified production activities allowed under Section 199 of the Internal Revenue Code. In the definition of "unitary business group", provides that the term "United States" means the 50 states, the District of Columbia, and any area over which the United States has asserted jurisdiction or claimed exclusive rights with respect to the exploration for or exploitation of natural resources, but does not include any territory or possession of the United States (currently, that definition does not include any territory or possession of the United States or any area over which the United States has asserted jurisdiction or claimed exclusive rights with respect to the exploration for or exploitation of natural resources). In that definition, further provides that the unitary business group may include members that are ordinarily required to apportion business income under different subsections of the Act. Provides that provisions related to the apportionment of income for federally regulated exchanges expire on December 31, 2017. Amends the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the Act also applies to online travel companies. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Cigarette Tax Act, the Cigarette Use Tax Act, the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act, the Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Telecommunications Excise Tax Act, and the Liquor Control Act of 1934 to provide for reductions in the vendor discount. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-03-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 135 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 1501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 309 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 630 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4004&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4004.htm |