IL HB3994 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0702
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0702
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides for licensure of stretcher van providers by the Department of Public Health. Provides that a stretcher van provider may provide transport of a passenger on a stretcher, provided the passenger needs no medical equipment, medical monitoring, or medical observation. Provides that a stretcher van provider may not provide transport of a passenger if the passenger is acutely ill, wounded, or medically unstable or meets certain other conditions. Sets forth the Department's responsibilities in connection with licensure of stretcher van providers. Effective immediately.
Title
IDPH-EMS-STRETCHER VAN PROVIDR
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Dennis Reboletti [R] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 96 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0702 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 096-021-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-21 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-19 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-19 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan | |
2009-05-19 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-04 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-02 | First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-010-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-001-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |