IL HB3988 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that in addition to any other sentence that may be imposed, the court shall order any person convicted of disorderly conduct to reimburse the public agency for the reasonable costs of the emergency response by the public agency if the conviction was for transmitting a false report to a peace officer, public officer or public employee to the effect that an offense will be committed, is being committed, or has been committed or for calling the number "911" for the purpose of making or transmitting a false alarm or complaint and reporting information. Changes the definition of "emergency response".
Title
CRIM CD-DISORDERLY CONDUCT
Sponsors
Rep. John Anthony [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0160 |
2015-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Connelly |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2015-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |