IL HB3969 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0967
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions and General Assembly Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. In the General Provisions Article, provides that, if a participant's final average salary in a participating system under the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act, other than the General Assembly Retirement System, is used to calculate a proportional retirement annuity for that participant under the General Assembly Retirement System and if that final average salary is higher than the highest salary for annuity purposes of that person under the General Assembly Retirement System, then the increased cost of the proportional annuity paid by the General Assembly Retirement System that is attributable to that higher level of compensation shall be paid by the employer of the participant under that system and not by the General Assembly Retirement System. In the General Assembly Article, provides that certain limitations on highest salary for annuity purposes apply to the earnings of a person who first became a member of the General Assembly Retirement System before August 22, 1994 if, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, that member irrevocably elects to have those limitations apply. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GA-FINAL SALARY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0967 |
2012-08-16 | House | Effective Date August 16, 2012 |
2012-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 117-000-001 |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-001 |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2012-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Cross |
2012-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Cross |
2012-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2012-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 24, 2012 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 010-000-000 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Held in Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
2012-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2012-01-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-166 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 2-108.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |