IL HB3963 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that for the purchase of any goods where a value-added reseller is used, the manufacturer of the goods must attest that every value-added reseller has the same discount or price from the manufacturer in order for the bid to be compliant. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-VALUE ADDED RESELL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |