IL HB3961 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0979
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0979
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the fiscal year of credit unions.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0979 |
2014-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-05-30 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 103-006-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-001-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-003-000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000 |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions Committee; 013-000-000 |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |