IL HB3961 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 041-076-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 041-076-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Law Enforcement Officer Stun Gun and Taser Use Reporting Act. Provides that beginning January 1, 2013 until December 31, 2017, subsequent to the use of a stun gun or taser by a State or local law enforcement officer to subdue a subject, the officer shall record certain information concerning the tased person. Provides that every law enforcement agency shall, by March 1 with regard to data collected during July through December of the previous calendar year and by August 1 with regard to data collected during January through June of the current calendar year, compile the data on the standardized law enforcement data compilation form provided by the University of Illinois and transmit the data to the University. Provides that the University of Illinois shall analyze the data provided by law enforcement agencies required by the Act and submit a report of the previous year's findings to the Governor, the General Assembly, and each law enforcement agency no later than July 1 of each year. Repeals the Act on July 1, 2018.
Title
TASER USE BY LAW ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 41 N: 76 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 041-076-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2012-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2012-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2012-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 004-003-000 |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2012-01-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-10 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monique D. Davis |