IL HB3947 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-9)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that a member of the General Assembly, his or her spouse, and any immediate family member living with that member of the General Assembly shall not, for compensation, lobby any official of the executive or legislative branch of State government or any official of any unit of local government. Provides that a person who violates these provisions is guilty of official misconduct, a Class 3 felony. Defines terms. Repeals current provisions banning members of the General Assembly from lobbying, a Class A misdemeanor. Effective immediately.
Title
GA MEMBER-LOBBYING BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-11-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-11-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-11-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-11-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-11-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-10-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3947&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3947.htm |