IL HB3934 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the court may not order the sealing or expungement of the records of arrests or charges not initiated by arrest that result in an order of supervision for or conviction of driving under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, intoxicating compound or compounds or any combination thereof (DUI) under the Illinois Vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance; except that the court may order the sealing of one misdemeanor record of arrest or charge not initiated by arrest that results in an order of supervision for or conviction of DUI under the Illinois Vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance per petitioner if each of the following conditions have been met: (1) the petitioner has not previously been convicted of or placed on supervision for DUI under the Illinois Vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance; (2) 10 or more years have passed since the termination of the petitioner's sentence; (3) during the commission of the violation, the petitioner did not proximately cause death or personal injury to any other person or damage the property of any other person; (4) the petitioner has no other misdemeanor or felony driving charge on his or her driving abstract; and (5) the judge examined the driving abstract of the petitioner petitioning to have his or her records sealed under this provision and made a finding entered on the record that the petitioner did not enter into a plea agreement on a lesser charge other than a DUI under the Illinois Vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance, and the facts did not support that the petitioner had previously committed a DUI under the Illinois Vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance. Provides that the Secretary of State shall maintain orders of court supervision and convictions for DUI under the Illinois vehicle Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance on court purposes driving abstracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL ID-SEALING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-29SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
2021-05-18SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-05-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-05-11SenateFirst Reading
2021-05-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021
2021-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-23HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 098-000-001
2021-04-22HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-16HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2021-03-19HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2021-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2021-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-03-18HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 067-040-000
2021-03-18HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback