IL HB3933 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that aggravated battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, includes a battery committed by a person who, at the time of the commission of the offense, is 21 years of age or older and the battery was committed upon an individual whom the person committing the offense knows to be a person working under the Adult Protective Services Program or an Ombudsman under the State Long Term Care Ombudsman Program of the Department on Aging, or a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony, except if the battery causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual, a violation is a Class 1 felony. Defines "Department of Children and Family Services employee" and "ombudsman".
Title
CRIM CODE-AGG BAT-EMPLOYEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-01-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-01-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-21 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3933&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB3933.htm |