IL HB3933 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Access to Justice Act. Makes changes in the Section concerning legislative findings. Defines "Foundation" and "Illinois Access to Civil Justice Council". Provides that the Illinois Access to Civil Justice Council shall develop (instead of the "General Assembly encourages the Supreme Court to develop") specified pilot programs. Provides that moneys in the Access to Justice Fund shall be directed to and used by the Attorney General for grants to the Illinois Equal Justice Foundation (instead of the Supreme Court) for specified purposes. Provides that grants made under the Act to the Foundation are subject to the requirements of the Illinois Grant Funds Recovery Act. Provides that the Foundation may make grants, enter into contracts, and take other actions recommended by the Council to effectuate the pilot programs and comply with the other requirements of the Act. Contains reporting and administration provisions. Provides that the Council (instead of the Supreme Court) shall study the effectiveness of the pilot programs and submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly by June 1, 2021 (instead of June 1, 2017). Amends the Clerks of Courts Act. Provides that on and after September 1, 2015 (instead of "[i]f the Supreme Court develops a pilot program to provide court-based legal assistance in accordance with the Access to Justice Act"), the clerks of the circuit court shall collect specified fees for deposit into the Access to Justice Fund. Repeals the Section concerning these fees on September 1, 2020 (instead of August 15, 2018). Effective immediately.
Title
ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Emily McAsey [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0281 |
2015-08-05 | House | Effective Date August 5, 2015 |
2015-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled |
2015-05-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2015-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-05-06 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-05-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-003-000 |
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 105 | 27.3g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 95 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 95 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 95 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 95 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 95 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |