IL HB3924 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Reporting of Deaths in Custody Act. Provides that, if a person dies while in the custody of a law enforcement agency or a peace officer, the law enforcement agency shall report the death to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority no later than 30 days after the date of death. Provides that the report shall be a public record under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the Authority shall issue an annual report tabulating and evaluating trends and information on deaths in custody. Provides that the family, next of kin, or other person nominated by the decedent as an emergency contact shall be notified, giving an accurate factual account of the cause of death and circumstances surrounding the death. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Provides that the Secretary of State shall annually report the number of permanent Illinois Identification Cards issued by the Secretary of State to persons presenting verification forms issued by the Department of Juvenile Justice and Department of Corrections; the report shall include data from the previous calendar year and shall reflect any increases or decreases; the Secretary of State shall publish the report on the Secretary's website. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the report of a death of a person to the Authority that occurs while the person is in a county juvenile detention or shelter care facility shall be transmitted to the Department of Juvenile Justice; the report of a death of a person that occurs while the person is in a jail or house of correction shall be transmitted to the Department of Corrections. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEATHS IN CUSTODY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
153354Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-14-1Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-15-2Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-2.5-75Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback