IL HB3921 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a person age 65 and older may cancel certain contracts within 15, rather than 3, days after the day the contract was signed. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANCEL CONTRACT SENIORS 15 DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052BAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback