IL HB3913 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Vehicle Retail Installment Sales Act. Provides that the maximum amount of the documentary fee for processing documents and performing services related to closing of a sale is restored to $150 (currently, the fee was increased to $300 on January 1, 2020). Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR VEHICLE-REPEAL DOC FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 375 | 11.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3913&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3913.htm |