IL HB3913 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Literacy Act. Repeals provisions concerning the Illinois Literacy Council and makes conforming changes. Repeals the Community Health Worker Advisory Board Act. Amends the School Code. Repeals provisions concerning the Committee of Cooperative Services and related sections. Amends the Illinois State University Law. Repeals provisions concerning the Illinois Institute for Entrepreneurship Education. Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Repeals provisions concerning the Health Care Worker Task Force. Amends the Afterschool Youth Development Project Act. Repeals provisions concerning the Illinois Youth Development Council and transfers certain functions of the Council to the Department of Human Services. Amends the Newborn Eye Pathology Act. Repeals provisions concerning the Newborn Eye Pathology Advisory Committee. Repeals provisions of the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois creating the Advisory Council on Youth HIV/AIDS Prevention Messages. Repeals provisions of the Historic Preservation Agency Act creating the Amistad Commission; makes a conforming change in the School Code. Repeals the Violence Prevention Task Force Act. Repeals provisions of the Head and Spinal Cord Injury Act creating the Advisory Council on Spinal Cord and Head Injuries; makes a conforming change in the State Finance Act.
Title
VARIOUS-BOARDS ABOLISHED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-assigned to Government Transparency Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 13B-35.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13B-35.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13B-35.20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-20.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-115 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 322 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 322 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
15 | 322 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-323 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2335 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 22 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 4028 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 65 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
325 | 27 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 27 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
325 | 27 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 27 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 27 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 223 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
410 | 515 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 515 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 515 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |