IL HB3911 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0352
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the First Responders Suicide Prevention Act. Provides that the First Responders Suicide Task Force shall make specified recommendations to specified entities.
Title
FIRST RESPONDERS TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar [D] | Sen. Seth Lewis [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0352 |
2021-08-13 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2022 |
2021-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2021-06-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Behavioral and Mental Health; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 098-000-001 |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Police & Fire Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |