IL HB3910 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Consumer Privacy Act. Provides that a consumer has the right to request that a business that collects the consumer's personal information disclose to that consumer the categories and specific pieces of personal information the business has collected. Requires a business to, at or before the point of collection, inform a consumer as to the categories of personal information to be collected and the purposes for which the categories of personal information shall be used. Requires the business to provide notice when collecting additional categories of personal information or when using a consumer's personal information for additional purposes. Provides that a consumer has the right to request that a business delete any personal information about the consumer which the business has collected from the consumer, with some exceptions. Requires a business that collects or sells a consumer's personal information to make certain disclosures to the consumer upon receipt of a verifiable consumer request. Provides that a consumer has the right, at any time, to opt out of the sale of his or her personal information to third parties. Prohibits a business from discriminating against a consumer who exercises any of the rights established under the Act by denying goods or services or charging the consumer different prices or rates for goods or services. Permits a business to provide financial incentives to a consumer that authorizes the sale of his or her personal information. Contains provisions concerning deadlines for processing a consumer's disclosure request; categories of personal information that must be disclosed; notice requirements; consumer information that is not subject to the Act's requirements; civil penalties for violations of the Act; and other matters. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Consumer Privacy Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSUMER PRIVACY ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-23HouseTo Civil Procedure & Tort Liability Subcommittee
2021-03-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-22HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-19HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.935New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback