IL HB3910 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-22 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hospital Emergency Service Act and the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that if an emergency room staff member has reasonable cause to believe that (i) an individual known to him or her in the course of performing his or her duties as an emergency room staff member is a victim of domestic violence and (ii) the individual has not reported the domestic violence to a law enforcement agency, the emergency room staff member must immediately report the suspected domestic violence to a law enforcement agency. Provides that an individual or entity participating in good faith in the making of a report is immune from liability. Provides that a person who violates these provisions commits disorderly conduct, and provides criminal penalties for violations. Requires hospitals to report to the Department of Public Health by January 1, 2011 concerning their implementation of these provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
HOSPITAL-REPORT DOMESTIC VIOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-04-22 | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-26 | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-26 | First Reading | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-02-26 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-02-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3910&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB3910.htm |