IL HB3909 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Repeals a Section providing authority to use automated traffic law enforcement systems at intersections in which cameras are used to photograph or video record a motor vehicle's failure to stop and yield as required by traffic control signals. Imposes limits on the power of local governments to use automated speed enforcement systems to provide recorded images of a motor vehicle for the purpose of recording its speed. Denies home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement from the State. Makes conforming and other technical changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-REPEAL REDLIGHT CAMERAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-11-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-10-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-10-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-10-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-10-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-10-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
62551-105.2Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208.3Amended CodeCitation Text
625511-208.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
625511-208.8Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-400Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-306.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback