IL HB3908 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Prohibits participation by a person who is an elected or appointed official of a forest preserve district and is first so elected or appointed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that a person who is an elected or appointed official of a forest preserve district shall not be considered a participating employee, unless (1) the person was first elected or appointed to that office before the effective date of the amendatory Act; (2) the person has elected to become a participating employee; and (3) the person has submitted logs evidencing that he or she has met a specified hourly standard. Contains provisions specifying the manner of documenting and submitting the time spent on official government business. Provides that an elected or appointed official of a forest preserve district who fails to submit time sheets or fails to conduct official government business for either 600 or 1,000 hours (whichever is applicable) with respect to that position shall not be permitted to continue participation in the Fund as an elected or appointed official of a forest preserve district. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-IMRF-FOREST PRESERVES
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 013-001-000 |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-137.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |