IL HB3905 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who intentionally misrepresents an animal as a service animal commits a petty offense. Provides that a person commits intentional misrepresentation of an animal as a service animal when the person: (1) intentionally misrepresents an animal in his or her possession as his or her service animal; (2) was previously given a warning that it is illegal to intentionally misrepresent an animal as a service animal; and (3) knows that the animal is a not a service animal.
Title
SERVICE ANIMAL-MISREPRESENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-03-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-001-000 |
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |