IL HB3898 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.
Title
PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Tabled |
2014-05-07 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-01 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-101.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |