IL HB3888 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0850
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0850
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Provides that no person may place or operate a vehicle, seaplane, watercraft, or other object of any kind in waters of this State if it has any aquatic plants or aquatic animals attached to the exterior of the vehicle, seaplane, watercraft, or other object. Provides that no person may take off with a seaplane, or transport or operate a vehicle, watercraft, or other object of any kind on a highway with aquatic plants or aquatic animals attached to the exterior of the seaplane, vehicle, watercraft, or other object. Provides exceptions. Provides that a person must comply with instructions given by a law enforcement officer who has reason to believe that the person is in violation of the new provisions. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall produce and make copies available of a notice containing a summary of the new provisions and that owners of boat access sites must post and maintain a copy of the notice.
Title
BOATS-AQUATIC LIFE TRANSPORT
Sponsors
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Karen May [D] | Sen. Suzi Schmidt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0850 |
2012-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-15 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-006-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 006-002-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-02-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-02-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-013-000 |
2012-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2012-01-24 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2011-11-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-11-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-11-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |